### Palindromic Numbers?

"Did you know that if you multiply 111,111,111 x 111,111,111 that the answer is consecutive? Try it and then check the answer to see what happens.

Explanation: in a mathematical context a palindrome is a number that reads the same in either a forward or backward direction. In other words a palindrome (or palindromic number) is equal to its reverse. Thus for example 1331 is a palindrome."

111111111x111111111.com

---------------------

Calculate more Curious Math:

11 x 11 = 121

111 x 111 = 12321

1111 x 1111 = 1234321

11111 x 11111 = 123454321

111111 x 111111 = 12345654321

1111111 x 1111111 = 1234567654321

11111111 x 11111111 = 123456787654321

111111111 x 111111111 = 12345678987654321

1 x 9 + 2 = 11

12 x 9 + 3 = 111

123 x 9 + 4 = 1111

1234 x 9 + 5 = 11111

12345 x 9 + 6 = 111111

123456 x 9 + 7 = 1111111

1234567 x 9 + 8 = 11111111

12345678 x 9 + 9 = 111111111

123456789 x 9 +10 = 1111111111

9 x 9 + 7 = 88

98 x 9 + 6 = 888

987 x 9 + 5 = 8888

9876 x 9 + 4 = 88888

98765 x 9 + 3 = 888888

987654 x 9 + 2 = 8888888

9876543 x 9 + 1 = 88888888

98765432 x 9 + 0 = 888888888

1 x 8 + 1 = 9

12 x 8 + 2 = 98

123 x 8 + 3 = 987

1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876

12345 x 8 + 5 = 98765

123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654

1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543

12345678 x 8 + 8 = 98765432

123456789 x 8 + 9 = 987654321

7 x 7 = 49

67 x 67 = 4489

667 x 667 = 444889

6667 x 6667 = 44448889

66667 x 66667 = 4444488889

666667 x 666667 = 444444888889

6666667 x 6666667 = 44444448888889

and so on

4 x 4 = 16

34 x 34 = 1156

334 x 334 = 111556

3334 x 3334 = 11115556

33334 x 33334 = 1111155556

6 x 37 = 222 and 2 + 2 + 2 = 6

9 x 37 = 333 and 3 + 3 + 3 = 9

12 x 37 = 444 and 4 + 4 + 4 = 12

15 x 37 = 555 and 5 + 5 + 5 = 15

18 x 37 = 666 and 6 + 6 + 6 = 18

21 x 37 = 777 and 7 + 7 + 7 = 21

24 x 37 = 888 and 8 + 8 + 8 = 24

27 x 37 = 999 and 9 + 9 + 9 = 27

Even more Curious Math

1 X 9 = 09 = 0 + 9 = 9

2 X 9 = 18 = 1 + 8 = 9

3 X 9 = 27 = 2 + 7 = 9

4 X 9 = 36 = 3 + 6 = 9

5 X 9 = 45 = 4 + 5 = 9

6 X 9 = 54 = 5 + 4 = 9

7 X 9 = 63 = 6 + 3 = 9

8 X 9 = 72 = 7 + 2 = 9

10 X 9 = 90 = 9 + 0 = 9

The magical number is9.

**-----------------------------**

**-----------------------------**

A. One thousand